THE MALPAS CHURCH JUNIOR SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
junior and infants school
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2006
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 06 August 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Houghton | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Susan Hunt | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tom Hills | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 01/01/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228 | £259 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 189 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 555 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 920 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1285 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1650 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 SEPTEMBER 1976 AS AMENDED 26 SEPTEMBER 1979.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE L.E.A.) ANS AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO MAY: (A) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND (B) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
THE CATCHMENT AREA OF THE SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
MALPAS CHURCH PRIMARY SCHOOL
YEWBERRY CLOSE
NEWPORT GWENT
NP20 6WJ
- Phone:
- 01633439255
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window