Financial history BREAST FRIENDS NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1171651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £30.22k £42.76k £40.68k £17.09k £31.96k
Total expenditure £6.08k £17.86k £32.19k £23.96k £27.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A