THE SUTTON HOO SHIP'S COMPANY

Charity number: 1175475
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 September 2018 18 December 2019 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 18 December 2019 141 days late Download