THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST. MARY MAGDALEN AND ST. PETER AND ST. PAUL ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA

Charity number: 1170031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time Download