Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST. MARY MAGDALEN AND ST. PETER AND ST. PAUL ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA

Charity number: 1170031
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £146.58k £113.19k £125.69k £100.75k £279.94k
Total expenditure £171.49k £154.85k £143.22k £162.72k £392.57k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £100 £250 N/A N/A N/A