Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH WITH ST. MARY MAGDALEN AND ST. PETER AND ST. PAUL ST. LEONARDS-ON-SEA
Charity number: 1170031

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev THOMAS PHILIP VALENTINE CROWLEY | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|||||
Susan Parsons | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|||||
CELIA ROSAMUND VEE MANNING | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tina-marie Grevett | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
John Lawrence Read | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN HART | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Rt. Rev PETER WHEATLEY | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY JANE HART | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Mark Smith | Trustee | 02 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR ANTHONY DAVIES | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|||||
JESSICA ANNE CAMPBELL | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
CAROLE SHERWOOD | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JOAN MACKAY | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW DOUGLAS KNIGHT | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ELIZABETH HARMAN | Trustee | 10 April 2011 |
|
|||||
MARY MARGARET LOUISE FISHER | Trustee | 21 March 2010 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ANN SHAW | Trustee | 25 March 2007 |
|
|||||
Rev. Dr. RICHARD GALE RALPH | Trustee | 25 March 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.