COMMUNITY HEALTH FIRST (CHF)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the charity helps build capacity in the local community to tackle health related issues
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brent
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 827 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2022 | 430 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2022 | 430 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Dec 2016
Charitable objects
A)RELIEF OF SICKNESS TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS IN BRENT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, COMMUNITY SUPPORT SERVICES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN HEALTH CARE BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, FORA AND BY THE PUBLICATION OF NEWSLETTERS DEVOTED TO HEALTHCARE. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE RESOURCES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN BRENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE TO THE PERMANENT AND TEMPORARY RESIDENTS IN THE HARLESDEN AND STONEBRIDGE WARDS OF BRENT BY. PROVIDING A DATABASE OF HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE LOCAL RESOURCES, E-BULLETINS; POSTERS; WORKSHOPS; NEWSLETTERS. RAISING AWARENESS OF LOCAL COMMUNITY HEALTH AND SOCILA CARE SERVICES AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ON HOW TO ACCESS LOCAL HEALTH AND COMMUNITY CARE SERVICES THAT CONTRIBUTE TO MEETING THE HEALTH AND SOCILA CARE NEEDS OF THE COMMUNITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT B)COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITY OF BRENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE HARLESDEN AND STONEBRIDGE WARDS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY THE ADVANCEMENT OF STRONGER LINKS AND PARTNERSHIPS BETWEEN THE COMMUNITIES AND THE VARIOUS HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE GROUPS AND ORGANISATIONS IN THOSE COMMUNITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFITS IN BRENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO THE PERMANENT AND TEMPORARY RESIDENTS OF HARLESDEN AND STONEBRIDGE WARDS BY PROVIDING NETWORK OPPORTUNITIES WITH AND BETWEEN, MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES; COMMUNITY GROUPS; AND ORGANISATIONS WITH THE COMMUNITY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELYT ON ISSUES SUCH AS HEALTH; HOUSING; EMPLOYMENT; COLD HOMES; ISOLATION; LONELINESS; EDUCATIO; FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY RELATING TO PEOPLES OWN HEALTH. INVOLVING THE LOCAL COMMUNITIES IN COLLECTIVE EFFORT SO THEY GAIN THE CONFIDENCE IN THEIR OWN ABILITIES TO INFLUENCE DECISIONS IN RELATION TO HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RELATING TO PEOPLES OWN HEALTH PROVIDING A PARTNERSHIP COMMUNITY FORUM, COMMUNITY CONSULTATION EVENTS, COMMUNITY HEALTH FAIRS, COMMUNITY E-BULLETINS, COMMUNITY VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES, AND COMMUNITY HEALTH CHAMPIONS ENABLING THE LOCAL COMMUNITY TO DEVELOP AND CONTRIBUTE TO A GREATER IMPACT ON THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING AGENDA FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT PARTICULARLY RELATING TO PEOPLES OWN HEALTH.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window