Accounts and annual returns AB LAHER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1170699
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 23 May 2022 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 23 May 2022 23 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 07 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 07 December 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 December 2019 401 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 December 2019 401 days late Download Open in new window