BYRNE AVENUE TRUST

Charity number: 1172104
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 12 October 2018 On time Download