1ST HARSTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 1174284
Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a wide range of Scouting Activities to 8 to 18 year olds in Harston and the South Cambs. area

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £21,369
Total expenditure: £18,502

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire
  • Hertfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 2017: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JAMES THOMAS PRISK Chair 18 July 2017
None on record
TRISTAN JOHN COPE Trustee 18 July 2017
None on record
COLIN BRIAN FREE Trustee 18 July 2017
None on record
Dr JONATHAN DAVID HALTON Trustee 18 July 2017
CAMBRIDGE WIND BAND
Received: On time
ROGER WILLIAM SUMMERFIELD Trustee 18 July 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £37.89k £36.84k £32.29k £16.00k £21.37k
Total expenditure £22.73k £40.58k £28.95k £20.81k £18.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 91 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 457 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
26 BURISTEAD ROAD
GREAT SHELFORD
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 5EJ
Phone:
01223871024