WINTERTON ON SEA LIFEBOAT RESTORATION GROUP

Charity number: 1173040
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 12 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 March 2020 22 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 12 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 March 2019 11 December 2019 On time Download
Annual return 12 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 12 March 2018 20 December 2018 On time Download
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)