SUSSEX STREET CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity number: 1171448
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 28 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 25 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 27 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 27 December 2018 On time Download