Accounts and annual returns THE GRIPS BRANCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1170274
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2021 11 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2019 03 February 2020 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2019 03 February 2020 2 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2018 03 February 2020 367 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2018 03 February 2020 367 days late Download Open in new window