Trustees SPORT AND ARTS IN THE COMMUNITY (SPARC) SOUTH WEST SHROPSHIRE

Charity number: 1170997
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachel Buchanan Trustee 18 November 2020
None on record
Sandra Reynolds Trustee 08 July 2020
None on record
Nicola Pugh Trustee 08 July 2020
None on record
Reuben Talbot Thorley Trustee 14 November 2018
None on record
Jean Shirley Trustee 05 January 2018
None on record
Nigel Hartin Trustee 07 December 2017
None on record
RYAN JOHN DAVIES Trustee 30 March 2017
None on record
Ruth Margaret Houghton Trustee 01 March 2017
BASIL HOUGHTON MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
BETHPHAGE
Received: On time
SIGHT LOSS SHROPSHIRE
Received: On time
Kevin William Bavastock Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Amanda Jane Cooke Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
GRAHAM STUART HEMMINGS Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record