Accounts and annual returns ST MARY'S COLLEGE OSCOTT CIO

Charity number: 1172979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 17 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 17 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 27 May 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 01 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 01 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 31 May 2019 On time Download Open in new window