THE GOOD SHEPHERD CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing outstanding additional supplies, resources and activities for pupils to access as part of an extended curriculum
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 10 April 2017: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GARETH RUSSELL | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE GOACHER | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
IMOGEN LAVELLE | Trustee | 10 April 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £101.55k | £90.10k | £73.84k | £125.25k | £62.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.01k | £77.60k | £83.76k | £133.32k | £45.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 25 November 2024 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 06 October 2023 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 06 October 2023 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 December 2021 | 167 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 09 November 2021 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Apr 2017
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. ALL MONEY RAISED IS USED TO PROVIDE THE SCHOOL WITH A WIDE RANGE OF RESOURCES FROM CLASSROOM EQUIPMENT, TO SECURITY MEASURES, PLAYGROUND ENHANCEMENT AND IT PROVISION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GOOD SHEPHERD RC PRIMARY SCHOOL
35 GAYFORD ROAD
LONDON
W12 9BY
- Phone:
- 02087435060
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window