Accounts and annual returns SAY FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1174389

Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 328 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 328 days | |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 23 November 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 02 December 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 02 December 2020 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2019 | 31 October 2019 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2019 | 17 January 2020 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window