Accounts and annual returns IHEART PRINCIPLES LIMITED

Charity number: 1173025
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 01 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 01 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2019 03 March 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 03 March 2020 3 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2018 18 February 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 23 November 2018 On time Download Open in new window