BOROUGHBRIDGE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY CARE

Charity number: 1171451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 25 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 25 October 2018 On time Download