THE OWEN KENNY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1172548
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 September 2020 27 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2020 27 June 2021 On time Download
Annual return 01 September 2019 06 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2019 22 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 01 September 2018 06 September 2019 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 September 2018 22 November 2019 144 days late Download