Accounts and annual returns THERAPIES UNITE

Charity number: 1177224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 20 February 2020 20 days late Download Open in new window