Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PAUL'S, CLAPHAM
Charity number: 1172605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Betts | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Tristram Holland | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anna Roads | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Roderick David Clark | Trustee | 15 May 2022 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas John Strachan | Trustee | 19 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Michelle Cameron-Knox | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Michael Robin McNish | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|||||||
Stacey Nadia McEwan | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Daley | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Elisabeth Maria Robinson | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Jonathan Boardman | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Barbara Roberts | Trustee | 27 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mrs A J Bishop | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Robert James Cowley | Trustee | 17 April 2016 |
|
|||||||
Rosemary Palmer | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
SYLVIA PHILLIPS | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.