Financial history ZAYNAB SALMASI CARDIOVASCULAR INTERNATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1170885
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £2.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A