THE TEMPSFORD MUSEUM AND ARCHIVES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide research and general public access to the museum's archives relating to Tempsford village and environs as well as RAF Tempsford. Also provide access to family history archives. The museum opens on the 1st Sunday of every month and also provides a meeting place for the community. Exhibitions are changed bi-monthly, talks and visits to historical locations are arranged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bedford
Governance
- 07 August 2017: CIO registration
- TEMPSFORD MUSEUM AND ARCHIVES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEVE JOHN COONEY | Chair | 07 August 2017 |
|
|||||
Jane Worboys | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David William Sutton | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sharman | Trustee | 18 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
LINDA BRENDA COLLINS | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|||||
CAROLE ANNE GOSLING | Trustee | 07 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.85k | £11.57k | £16.84k | £5.51k | £7.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.40k | £3.14k | £5.58k | £9.94k | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £100 | £9.00k | £13.28k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 04 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Aug 2017
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A MUSEUM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 STATION ROAD
TEMPSFORD
BEDS.
SG19 2AX
- Phone:
- 01767640968
- Email:
- steve.cooney1@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window