Accounts and annual returns JUSTICE MEXICO NOW

Charity number: 1177740
Charity reporting is overdue by 1104 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 8 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 8 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 18 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 February 2021 25 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1104 days