DRAPER TOGETHER

Charity number: 1173496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 19 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 06 December 2018 On time Download