Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, HENLEY IN ARDEN

Charity number: 1170376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 13 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 07 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 July 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required