Financial history FRIENDS OF ST MARY'S, HENLEY IN ARDEN

Charity number: 1170376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £7.48k £5.88k £3.95k £3.26k £4.09k
Total expenditure £7.80k £4.42k £3.65k £6.78k £3.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A