Trustees Leigh Folk Arts Association
Charity number: 1171298
Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Harding | Chair | 17 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elliott Waters | Trustee | 23 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sarah-Jane Holmes | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Dart | Trustee | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Sidney Batch | Trustee | 11 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
KEITH BAXTER | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
PAUL COLLIER | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL DAVISON | Trustee | 24 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Simon Gentry | Trustee | 15 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.