Trustees BRYMBO HERITAGE TRUST
Charity number: 1174269
Charity reporting is up to date (15 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLAS STEPHEN AMYES | Chair | 20 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Howard Foster | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Barry Archie Thomas | Trustee | 20 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
REGINALD KEITH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 08 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD PAUL WINSTANLEY | Trustee | 08 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mark Peacock | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Darren Nigel Williams | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Bowen | Trustee | 02 April 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.