THE WORD FOREST ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1172497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 29 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 26 May 2020 111 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 26 May 2020 111 days late Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 26 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 26 January 2019 On time Download