Financial history THE WORD FOREST ORGANISATION

Charity number: 1172497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £22.15k £85.32k £41.47k £76.15k £81.38k
Total expenditure £20.99k £79.04k £38.16k £69.67k £96.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £7.50k N/A