Accounts and annual returns THE INITIATION TO LAW GROUP

Charity number: 1171845
Charity reporting is overdue by 3 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Overdue Overdue by 3 days
Annual return 30 November 2020 08 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 08 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2019 08 April 2021 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 08 April 2021 190 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2018 20 January 2020 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 20 January 2020 112 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2017 25 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 25 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window