Accounts and annual returns WINSLOW CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1172013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 18 May 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 February 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 13 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 November 2019 130 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 07 November 2019 130 days late Download Open in new window