THE MARY PRITCHARD PRIZE FUND

Charity number: 509243
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 20 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 16 June 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required