THE MARY PRITCHARD PRIZE FUND

Charity number: 509243
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £1.98k £1.61k £1.60k £1.69k £0
Total expenditure £932 £3.07k £2.00k £2.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A