Accounts and annual returns NTC TOURING THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 509251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 09 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 11 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 01 November 2017 On time Download Open in new window