Trustees NTC TOURING THEATRE COMPANY LIMITED

Charity number: 509251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN MARGARET WILSON Chair
NORTH EAST THEATRE TRUST LIMITED
Received: 1 day late
Craig Weir Trustee 20 February 2020
None on record
JOHN ALEXANDER JAMES McDERMOTT Trustee 11 February 2019
AMBLE YOUTH PROJECT LIMITED
Kate Morrison Trustee 11 February 2019
None on record
Jane Robina Dargue Trustee 11 February 2019
None on record
N. Mundy Ltd Trustee 18 April 2018
None on record
ROGER STYRING Trustee 12 November 2013
NORTH EAST EQUALITY & DIVERSITY LIMITED
Received: On time
ALNWICK DISTRICT PLAYHOUSE TRUST
Received: 67 days late
THE ST HILDA'S TRUST
Received: On time
ALNWICK SPORTING CLUB LTD
Received: On time
NORTHUMBRIAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION
Received: On time
NORTHUMBRIAN INDUSTRIAL MISSION LTD
Recently registered
BRYAN ELLIS Trustee 20 November 2012
ALNWICK SPORTING CLUB LTD
Received: On time
ROSALIND ELIZABETH MAUDSLEY Trustee
None on record