Financial history BATH WELCOMES REFUGEES

Charity number: 1171442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £29.55k £21.22k £15.50k £19.15k £124.39k
Total expenditure £20.72k £10.71k £21.26k £33.41k £52.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £11.20k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A