Trustees BATH WELCOMES REFUGEES

Charity number: 1171442
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Macdiarmid Chair 07 November 2019
NORTH BRISTOL ADVICE CENTRE
Received: On time
Rosalind Kerenza Osborne Calamvokis Trustee 12 February 2024
None on record
Kathryn Anna Kyle Trustee 08 August 2023
None on record
Stephen Charles Whittle Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Clare Louise Rickitt Trustee 23 June 2023
None on record
Violet Jensen Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
Robert Clift Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record