BLACKPOOL,FYLDE AND WYRE SAMARITANS

Charity number: 1170657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TO ENABLE PERSONS IN BLACKPOOL, FYLDE & WYRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA AS WELL AS ELSEWHERE WHO ARE EXPERIENCING FEELINGS OF DISTRESS AND DESPAIR, INCLUDING THOSE WHO MAY BE AT RISK OF SUICIDE, TO RECEIVE CONFIDENTIAL EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AT ANY TIME OF THE DAY OR NIGHT IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THEIR EMOTIONAL HEALTH AND TO REDUCE THE INCIDENCE OF SUICIDE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £54,359
Total expenditure: £68,900

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackpool

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 June 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW DAVID SMITH Trustee 18 July 2024
None on record
IAN FLOWERS Trustee 18 July 2024
None on record
Dianne Joyce Whitehead Trustee 27 July 2023
None on record
Sylvia Brookes Trustee 27 July 2023
None on record
Nicholas Bachmann Trustee 27 July 2023
None on record
CAROLYN LAMB Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
OLIVIA TUDOR Trustee 21 July 2022
None on record
KAREN SMITH Trustee 23 July 2021
None on record
DAVID GRUNDY Trustee 23 July 2021
None on record
ANNETTE COLLINGE Trustee 30 June 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £56.13k £94.84k £49.17k £68.76k £54.36k
Total expenditure £70.71k £70.59k £64.46k £49.68k £68.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.92k £71.40k £2.83k N/A £3.03k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 APRIL 1981 AS AMENDED 26TH SEPTEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 2006 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 11 JAN 2016 AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN BLACKPOOL, FYLDE & WYRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND 2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
BLACKPOOL, FYLDE AND WYRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Registration history
  • 12 June 1981 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
16 EDWARD STREET
BLACKPOOL
LANCASHIRE
FY1 1BA
Phone:
01253299567