THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHAW CUM DONNINGTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Mary's is a church that is part of the Oxford Diocese in Berkshire. Regular services take place during the week and at weekends. Weddings, Baptisms and Funerals also take place. St Mary's plays an active part in the local community and runs lunch clubs for elderly residents, a support group for those who have been bereaved as well as a number of activities for young people and families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 18 April 2017: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Raymond Clive Obin | Chair | 21 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Sievers | Trustee | 23 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Eleanor Almond | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosamund Gillian Stuart | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Harwood | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Edward John Charles Yates | Trustee | 02 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Steven Richard Joplin | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Willetts | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARY VERONICA DAWKINS | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK HUTSON | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mike Stuart | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JANE BRADFORD | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL HASLAM | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MARY GOLDSACK | Trustee | 17 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.68k | £139.04k | £79.60k | £84.17k | £93.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.76k | £78.12k | £86.87k | £93.23k | £97.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 02 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH, PASTORAL, EVANGELISTIC, SOCIAL AND ECUMENICAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH ROAD
NEWBURY
BERKSHIRE
- Phone:
- 0163540450
- Email:
- office@shawchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window