Trustees REFUGEES AT HOME
Charity number: 1177765

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rebecca Young | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Magid El-Amin | Trustee | 14 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Bethell | Trustee | 11 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ahmad Al Rashid | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lisa Ines del Tufo | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Osborne Hughes | Trustee | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Daniel James Gerring | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|||||
SARA CATHERINE NATHAN | Trustee | 17 February 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.