SOUTH ATLANTIC ENVIRONMENTAL RESEARCH INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1173105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 July 2020 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 03 July 2020 64 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 09 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 09 April 2019 On time Download