Trustees THE FUSILIER MUSEUM LONDON

Charity number: 1171068
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Diggins OBE Chair 15 July 2022
None on record
Anthony Conway Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Catherine Sarah Day Lee Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Mary Jayapal-Rajiah Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Gabriella Incalza Trustee 18 July 2023
None on record
Colonel B Gorski Trustee 17 July 2018
THE FUSILIERS MUSEUM AND LEARNING CENTRE LIMITED
Received: On time
ANDREW CURTIS WARREN Trustee 10 January 2017
None on record
Colonel Nigel Peter Easton Trustee 10 January 2017
THE HARBEN ARMOURY FUND
Received: On time
THE FUSILIERS LONDON FUND
Overdue by 123 days
THE ROYAL FUSILIERS ASSOCIATION
Overdue by 123 days
THE CITY OF LONDON BATTALION THE ROYAL FUSILIERS (CITY OF LONDON REGIMENT) CHARITY FUND
Received: On time
Major Michael McCarthy MBE Trustee 01 September 2015
THE HARBEN ARMOURY FUND
Received: On time