NEW LIFE WALES

Charity number: 1170931
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our activities are to teach the Bible and help people to follow the teachings of Jesus Christ.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 December 2016: CIO registration
  • 06 November 2024: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 06 November 2024: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £2.65k £0
Total expenditure £2.31k £0
Income from government contracts £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 187 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 553 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 918 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1283 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1648 days
Submit annual return Open in new window