BAKEWELL CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 509299
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £18.66k £15.29k £15.32k £19.96k £12.65k
Total expenditure £16.34k £14.55k £16.61k £20.67k £15.42k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A