BAKEWELL CHORAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bakewell Choral Society was formed to enable local people to come together to sing for pleasure. The choir is open to all who wish to sing. The Society puts on 4 concerts a year featuring a variety of music. To enable people to attend our concerts we provide a free-to-user transport facility and this is provided by the Society using a local community bus service.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 24 October 1979: Standard registration
- BAKEWELL AND DISTRICT CHORAL SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Hutchinson | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Dalby | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
paul batson ARCM | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Hatfield | Trustee | 27 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Mitchell | Trustee | 17 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.65k | £5.68k | £10.55k | £22.35k | £18.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.42k | £4.12k | £13.72k | £17.07k | £20.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 15 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 07 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 5 FEBRUARY 1979 AS AMENDED 3 SEPTEMBER 1979, 2 FEBRUARY 1981 AND 13 JANUARY 1997 AND 14 OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY SHALL BE IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC IN THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Gabriel Cottage
Main Street
Winster
MATLOCK
Derbyshire
DE4 2DJ
- Phone:
- 01629582591
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window