SANCTUARY HOSTING LIMITED

Charity number: 1173191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 15 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 08 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 08 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 31 October 2018 On time Download