SANCTUARY HOSTING LIMITED

Charity number: 1173191
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Joanna Walton Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Theresa Foster Trustee 10 August 2018 None on record
ALISON ROSEMARY BAXTER Chair 12 April 2018 None on record
Emily Sarah Bruce Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
ROSEMARY HAINES Trustee 19 January 2017 None on record
Marc Lafferty Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
GOYTOM FISSEHAYE Trustee 28 March 2017 None on record
Damon Boughen Trustee 21 May 2020 None on record
Luca Galvani Trustee 22 March 2021 None on record
Kathryn Grace Bowen Trustee 12 April 2018 None on record
MATTHEW GRAINGER Trustee 17 February 2017 None on record
Dr Kenneth James King Trustee 19 January 2017 None on record